EP0222262 - Sealing arrangement for a turbo pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EG & G SEALOL: Société à Responsabilité Limitée dite 18ter, rue des Osiers Coignieres F-78310 Maurepas (Yvelines) / FR | [1987/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villeneuve, Michel 26, rue du Coquet F-27950 Saint Marcel(Eure) / FR | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Simonnot, Bernard, et al Cabinet Simonnot 35 rue de Clichy 75442 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | Simonnot, Bernard, et al Cabinet Simonnot 35 rue de Clichy F-75442 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 86115043.1 | 29.10.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | FR19850016595 | 08.11.1985 Original published format: FR 8516595 | [1987/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0222262 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0222262 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/12 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
F04D29/128 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1987/21] | Title | German: | Abdichtungseinrichtung für Turbopumpe | [1987/21] | English: | Sealing arrangement for a turbo pump | [1987/21] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité de turbopompe | [1987/21] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 16.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB784708 (JAMES WALKER AND COMPANY LTD); | [A]US2882075 (BIERING ROBERT C, et al); | [Y]FR1303790 (WORTHINGTON CORP); | [Y]FR2000565 (BORG WARNER); | [A]US3675933 (NAPPE WILLIAM D) |