EP0224728 - Boiling water nuclear reactor fuel assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/24] | Nuclear reactor fuel assembly | ||
[1990/29] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 20.06.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Gossen-Strasse 100 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | ||
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states KRAFTWERK UNION AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wiesenstrasse 35 D-4330 Mülheim (Ruhr) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lill, Günther, Dr. Dipl.-Phys. Händelstrasse 10 D-8522 Herzogenaurach / DE | 02 /
Holzer, Rolf, Dipl.-Phys. Schallershoferstrasse 48a D-8520 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Lettau, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Lettenfeld 14 D-8521 Effeltrich / DE | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1987/40] |
Former [1987/24] | Mehl, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 22 13 17 D-80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115159.5 | 31.10.1986 | [1987/24] | Priority number, date | DE19853540466 | 14.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3540466 | [1987/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0224728 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0224728 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G21C3/32 | [1987/24] | CPC: |
G21C3/322 (EP,US);
G21C3/3225 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | Siedewasser-Kernreaktorbrennelement | [1990/29] | English: | Boiling water nuclear reactor fuel assembly | [1990/29] | French: | Assemblage de combustible d un réacteur nucléaire à eau bouillante | [1990/29] |
Former [1987/24] | Kernreaktorbrennelement | ||
Former [1987/24] | Nuclear reactor fuel assembly | ||
Former [1987/24] | Assemblage de combustible d'un réacteur nucléaire | Examination procedure | 08.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/36] | 17.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.1991
17.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE Opponent's representative Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.04.1991
17.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE Opponent's representative Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 20.06.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.10.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 01.04.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 18.06.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/32] | Appeal following opposition | 03.08.1993 | Appeal received No. T0747/93 | 12.10.1993 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.04.1997 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 24.04.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.1997 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 18.07.1990 | |
LI | 18.07.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1276233 (GEN NUCLEAR ENGINEERING CO); | [A]EP0086427 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2166089 (ASEA ATOM AB) |