EP0224736 - Curable compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY One Cyanamid Plaza Wayne, NJ 07470-8426 / US | [1994/04] |
Former [1987/24] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucas, Howard Robert 16 Grove Place Danbury Connecticut 06810 / US | 02 /
Lees, Robert Gerald 14 Ferris Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06854 / US | 03 /
Burkhard, Herbert 13 Lorraine Drive Eastchester New York 10709 / US | 04 /
Ley, David Arthur 130 Fieldcrest Road New Canaan Connecticut 06840 / US | [1987/24] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/24] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115247.8 | 04.11.1986 | [1987/24] | Priority number, date | US19850801526 | 25.11.1985 Original published format: US 801526 | [1987/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0224736 | Date: | 10.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0224736 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0224736 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C09D133/00, C08L33/20, C08L33/24, C08F8/00 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
C08L33/24 (EP);
C08L33/26 (KR);
C08L33/20 (KR);
C09D133/24 (EP);
C09D157/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/47] | C09D3/80, C08L33/20, C08L33/24, C08F8/00 | ||
Former IPC [1987/24] | C09D3/80, C08L33/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/24] | Title | German: | Vernetzbare Zusammensetzungen | [1987/24] | English: | Curable compositions | [1987/24] | French: | Compositions réticulables | [1987/24] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 10.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.04.1994 | CH | 06.04.1994 | GR | 06.04.1994 | IT | 06.04.1994 | LI | 06.04.1994 | SE | 06.04.1994 | ES | 17.07.1994 | [2004/03] |
Former [2002/23] | BE | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
GR | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
SE | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
GR | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | BE | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 06.04.1994 | |
LI | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2042715 (REICHHOLD ALBERT CHEMIE AG); | [AD]EP0020000 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [Y]CA1209583 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO) | [Y] - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, Vol. 1, 2nd Ed., 1985; John Wiley & Sons, New York, US; W.M. THOMAS et al.: "Acrylamide polymers", pages 169-211 |