EP0223154 - Layer removing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.07.1991 [1991/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/22] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schön, Klaus-Peter Rathenauplatz 14 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | [1987/22] | Application number, filing date | 86115359.1 | 06.11.1986 | [1987/22] | Priority number, date | DE19853540588 | 15.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3540588 | [1987/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223154 | Date: | 27.05.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0223154 | Date: | 18.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/26 | [1987/22] | CPC: |
G03F7/3042 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/22] | Title | German: | Entschichtungsvorrichtung | [1987/22] | English: | Layer removing device | [1987/22] | French: | Dispositif d'élimination d'une couche | [1987/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/46] | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5764740 ; | [A]US4068251 (SCHROTER HERBERT, et al); | [A]US4081577 (HORNER ELLWOOD J); | [A]US4334755 (HARRELL ROBERT E, et al); | [A]EP0114402 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 145 (P-132)[1023], 4. August 1982; & JP-A-57 64 740 (NIPPON DENSHIN DENWA KOSHA) 20-04-1982, & JP5764740 A 00000000 |