EP0225491 - Tanning agent and method for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1990 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 20.03.1991 [1991/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASSELLA Aktiengesellschaft Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | [1987/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Riegel, Ulrich Steinäckerstrasse 6 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 61 / DE | 02 /
Engelhardt, Fritz, Dr. Hünfelder Strasse 20 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 61 / DE | 03 /
Reh, Kuno, Dr. Lauterbacher Strasse 14 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 61 / DE | 04 /
Croon, Helmut, Dr. Nordring 97 D-6000 Frankfurt am Main 61 / DE | 05 /
Becker, Hermann Mühlstrasse 6 D-6054 Jügesheim b. Offenbach / DE | 06 /
Lotz, Werner, Dr. Rossertblick 16 D-6272 Niedernhausen / DE | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Urbach, Hans-Georg, et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 60386 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | Urbach, Hans-Georg, Dr., et al Hanauer Landstrasse 526 D-60386 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115504.2 | 08.11.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | DE19853540211 | 13.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3540211 | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225491 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225491 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225491 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C14C3/08 | [1987/25] | CPC: |
C14C3/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/25] | Title | German: | Gerbstoff und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1987/25] | English: | Tanning agent and method for its manufacture | [1987/25] | French: | Tanit et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/25] | Examination procedure | 14.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/24] | 21.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 06.09.1989 | GB | 06.09.1989 | CH | 30.11.1989 | LI | 30.11.1989 | [1991/12] |
Former [1990/46] | GB | 06.09.1989 | |
CH | 30.11.1989 | ||
LI | 30.11.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | GB | 06.09.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE918779 (ROEHM & HAAS GMBH); | [A]GB777474 (ST LAWRENCE CORP LTD) |