EP0267318 - Alloy for ornamental purposes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.11.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. HAFNER GmbH & Co. Bleichstrasse 13-17 75173 Pforzheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states C. HAFNER GmbH & Co. Bleichstrasse 13-17 D-75173 Pforzheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knosp, Helmut, Dr. Friedenstrasse 110 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Trappenberg, Hans Trappenberg u. Dimmerling, Wendtstrasse 1, Postfach 21 13 75 W-7500 Karlsruhe 21 / DE | [1988/20] | Application number, filing date | 86115798.0 | 13.11.1986 | [1988/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0267318 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0267318 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22C5/04, A44C27/00 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
A44C27/003 (EP);
C22C5/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1988/20] | Title | German: | Legierung für Schmuckzwecke | [1988/20] | English: | Alloy for ornamental purposes | [1988/20] | French: | Alliage pour objets de parure | [1988/20] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 14.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 03.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1992/01] | 22.07.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.12.1986 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   02.02.1987 | 15.12.1986 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   02.02.1987 | 15.12.1986 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   02.02.1987 | 15.12.1986 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   02.02.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB581478 [ ]; | DE394045 [ ]; | GB689553 [ ]; | FR777839 [ ]; | FR886117 [ ]; | FR866117 [ ]; | FR820765 [ ]; | FR851698 [ ] |