EP0222415 - Viral glycoprotein subunit vaccine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.12.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Research Corporation Suite 853, 25 Broadway New York New York 10004 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | For all designated states Research Corporation Suite 853, 25 Broadway New York New York 10004 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Compans, Richard W. Route 1 Box 406 Helena Alabama / US | 02 /
Ray, Ranjit 1600 9th Avenue South Apartment 4E Birmingham Alabama / US | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/21] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115854.1 | 14.11.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | US19850798536 | 15.11.1985 Original published format: US 798536 | [1987/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0222415 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0222415 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/12, C12N5/00, A61K39/42 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K16/10 (EP,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18622 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/21] | Title | German: | Viraler Glycoprotein-Untereinheit-Impfstoff | [1987/21] | English: | Viral glycoprotein subunit vaccine | [1987/21] | French: | Vaccin à base de sous-unité glycoprotéinique virale | [1987/21] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 15.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 09.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.1992 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/03] | 27.08.1992 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.09.1992 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4117113 [ ] (ALLISON ANTHONY CLIFFORD, et al); | EP0017557 [ ] (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | GB2066203 [ ] (HUMAN OLTOANYAGTERMELO); | EP0047480 [ ] (FRAPPIER ARMAND INST [CA]); | EP0129923 [ ] (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]); | EP0133123 [ ] (MOLECULAR GENETICS INC [US]); | EP0135841 [ ] (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST [JP]) |