EP0226056 - Swivel device for the work piece spindle head of a grinding machine, especially a cylindrical internal-grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.05.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEB Werkzeugmaschinenkombinat "7. Oktober" Berlin Leninallee 399 DDR-1140 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states VEB Werkzeugmaschinenkombinat "7. Oktober" Berlin Leninallee 399 DDR-1140 Berlin / DD | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diesing, Kurt DDR-1170 Berlin Zur Nachtheide 72 / DD | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Zellentin & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Nigerstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | Patentanwälte Zellentin & Partner Zweibrückenstrasse 15 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115865.7 | 14.11.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | DD19770002841 | 12.12.1985 Original published format: DD 284177 | [1987/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226056 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226056 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24B41/00, B24B5/06 | [1989/18] | CPC: |
B24B41/06 (EP);
B24B5/06 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/26] | B24B41/06 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/26] | Title | German: | Schwenkeinrichtung für den Werkstückspindelkasten einer Schleifmaschine, insbesondere Innenrundschleifmaschine | [1987/26] | English: | Swivel device for the work piece spindle head of a grinding machine, especially a cylindrical internal-grinding machine | [1987/26] | French: | Dispositif de pivotement de la poupée porte-pièce d'une rectifieuse, en particulier d'une rectifieuse cylindrique d'intérieur | [1987/26] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/27] | 06.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.12.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0131366 ; | [A]DE1279500 |