EP0224172 - Recording liquid and recording method by use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwata, Kazuo 1-14-102, Kirigaoka 4-chome Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Tochihara, Shinichi 2301-5, Yokouchi Hiratsuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Koike, Shoji 1-13-301, Kanandai 2-chome Konan-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Tomida, Yasuko 4236-605, Asahi-cho 5-chome Atsugi-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/23] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/23] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86115938.2 | 17.11.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | JP19850256767 | 18.11.1985 Original published format: JP 25676785 | [1987/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0224172 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0224172 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0224172 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D11/16 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
C09D11/30 (EP,US);
C09D11/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1987/23] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsflüssigkeit und Aufzeichnungsverfahren unter Verwendung derselben | [1987/23] | English: | Recording liquid and recording method by use thereof | [1987/23] | French: | Liquide d'enregistrement et procédé d'enregistrement en comportant l'utilisation | [1987/23] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/05] | 25.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 31.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1991
10.12.1991
ADMISSIBLE Schwan-STABILO Schwanhäusser GmbH & Co. Maxfeldstrasse 3 D-90409 Nürnberg / DE | 02
06.12.1991
10.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1991
10.12.1991
ADMISSIBLE Schwan-STABILO Schwanhäusser GmbH & Co. Maxfeldstrasse 3 D-90409 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
06.12.1991
10.06.1992
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1992/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1991
Schwan-STABILO Schwanhäusser GmbH & Co. Maxfeldstrasse 3 D-90409 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02
07.12.1991
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | |||
Former [1991/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.07.1991
ADMISSIBLE Schwan-STABILO Schwanhäusser GmbH & Co. Maxfeldstrasse 3 D-90409 Nürnberg / DE | 27.12.1991 | No. 02: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 04.02.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.11.1993 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1993 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 28.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 15.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 16.07.1996 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.07.1996 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 21.04.1997 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0085869 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]) |