EP0225515 - Pipe clamp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Müller, Franz Eichelhäherstrasse 1 D-65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [1987/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Jochem, Bernd Heinrich - Erb - Partner Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Hanauer Landstrasse 126-128 60314 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Jochem, Bernd Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem Postfach 18 02 04 60083 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [1987/25] | Jochem, Bernd, Dipl.-Wirtsch.-Ing. Patentanwälte Beyer & Jochem, Postfach 17 01 45 D-60075 Frankfurt/Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116048.9 | 20.11.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | DE19853543383 | 07.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543383 | [1987/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225515 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225515 | Date: | 11.11.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225515 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16L33/04, F16L3/10 | [1987/46] | CPC: |
F16L3/1016 (EP);
F16L33/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/25] | F16L33/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/25] | Title | German: | Rohrschelle | [1987/25] | English: | Pipe clamp | [1987/25] | French: | Collier de serrage | [1987/25] | Examination procedure | 26.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/04] | 07.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.07.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89101504.2 / EP0319521 | Opposition(s) | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2368929 (KING JAMES T); | [A]US2941273 (SKELLY JAMES J); | [A]GB1033659 (AEROQUIP AG); | [A]DE6900634U (SCHLEMPER ERICH [DE]); | [AD]DE3346423 (TOGE DUEBEL A GERHARD GMBH [DE]); | [AD]DE3308459 (WOELFEL PETER DIPL ING) |