EP0224210 - Means for detecting peroxidase activity, preparation process and its use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 35001 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/23] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pauly, Hans Erwin, Dr. Finkenstrasse 1 D-3563 Dautphetal / DE | 02 /
Schwarz, Herbert Am Kirtenfeld 3 D-3557 Ebsdorfergrund / DE | [1987/23] | Representative(s) | Klein, Otto, et al Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, SU Patente 84504 Burgkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Klein, Otto, Dr., et al Hoechst AG, Werk Gendorf, Patentbüro D-84504 Burgkirchen / DE | ||
Former [1987/23] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, Dr. Hoechst AG, Werk Kalle-Albert, Zentrale Patentabteilung KA D-65174 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116137.0 | 21.11.1986 | [1987/23] | Priority number, date | DE19853541978 | 28.11.1985 Original published format: DE 3541978 | [1987/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0224210 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0224210 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/72, C12Q1/26 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
C12Q1/28 (EP,US);
G01N33/725 (EP,US);
C12Q2326/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/23] | Title | German: | Mittel zur Bestimmung von Peroxidase-Aktivität, Verfahren zur Herstellung und seine Verwendung | [1987/23] | English: | Means for detecting peroxidase activity, preparation process and its use | [1987/23] | French: | Moyens de détection de l'activité peroxydasique, procédé de préparation et application | [1987/23] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/02] | 28.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2295425 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4077772 (GEISSLER ULRICH C, et al); | [A]US4340394 (MAGERS THOMAS A, et al); | [X]EP0121317 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]); | [A]US4504579 (SUN MING [US]) |