EP0228562 - Tubular food casings with improved end closures and methods of manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEEPAK, INC. Executive Plaza East Suite 1100 1211 West 22nd Street Oakbrook Illinois 60521 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | For all designated states Teepak, Inc. Executive Plaza East Suite 1100 1211 West 22nd Street Oakbrook Illinois 60521 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lithgow, John P. 9402 East Raymond Indianapolis Indiana 46239 / US | 02 /
Niedenthal, Mark J. 137 East Attica Rossville Illinois 60963 / US | 03 /
Gilbert, Donald K. 2 South Oak Court Columbia South Carolina 29210 / US | 04 /
Miller, Fredric N. 888 Honest Pleasure Drive Naperville Illinois 60540 / US | 05 /
Hine, Rodney J. 1502 North Vermilion Danville Illinois 61832 / US | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Weber, Dieter, et al Weber, Seiffert, Lieke Postfach 61 45 65051 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Weber, Dieter, Dr., et al Weber, Dieter, Dr., Seiffert, Klaus, Dipl.-Phys., Lieke, Winfried, Dr. Postfach 61 45 D-65051 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116204.8 | 21.11.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | US19850809100 | 16.12.1985 Original published format: US 809100 | [1987/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0228562 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228562 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A22C13/02 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
A22C13/0009 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1324 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | Rohrförmige Hülle für Nahrungsmittel mit Endverschluss und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1987/29] | English: | Tubular food casings with improved end closures and methods of manufacture | [1987/29] | French: | Enveloppe tubulaire pour produits alimentaires à fermeture d'extrémité et son procédé de fabrication | [1987/29] | Examination procedure | 07.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.10.1991 | BE | 09.10.1991 | CH | 09.10.1991 | GR | 09.10.1991 | IT | 09.10.1991 | LI | 09.10.1991 | SE | 09.10.1991 | ES | 20.01.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
BE | 09.10.1991 | ||
CH | 09.10.1991 | ||
GR | 09.10.1991 | ||
IT | 09.10.1991 | ||
LI | 09.10.1991 | ||
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
BE | 09.10.1991 | ||
CH | 09.10.1991 | ||
IT | 09.10.1991 | ||
LI | 09.10.1991 | ||
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
BE | 09.10.1991 | ||
CH | 09.10.1991 | ||
LI | 09.10.1991 | ||
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/29] | AT | 09.10.1991 | |
CH | 09.10.1991 | ||
LI | 09.10.1991 | ||
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/21] | CH | 09.10.1991 | |
LI | 09.10.1991 | ||
SE | 09.10.1991 | ||
Former [1992/16] | CH | 09.10.1991 | |
LI | 09.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CH473004 (KALLE AG [DE]); | [A]DE2165191 (KALLE AG); | [A]FR2253461 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [A]EP0087241 (DEVRO INC [US]); | [Y]EP0128668 (DEVRO INC [US]) |