EP0235369 - Fume burning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Basic, John N. Sr. 41 W 202 Whitney Road St. Charles Illinois 60174 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states Basic, John N. Sr. 41 W 202 Whitney Road St. Charles Illinois 60174 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Hemmerich, Friedrich Werner, et al Patentanwälte HEMMERICH-MÜLLER-GROSSE-POLLMEIER-MEY Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 55 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116252.7 | 24.03.1982 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | US19810248054 | 27.03.1981 Original published format: US 248054 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235369 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235369 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F23G7/06, F23G5/50, F23G5/16 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
F23H3/02 (EP,US);
F23G7/00 (KR);
F23G5/165 (EP,US);
F23G5/44 (EP,US);
F23G5/46 (EP,US);
F23G5/50 (EP,US);
F23G7/065 (EP,US);
F23J1/02 (EP,US);
F23L1/02 (EP,US);
F23M5/08 (EP,US);
F23M9/04 (EP,US);
F23M9/06 (EP,US);
F23G2203/107 (EP,US);
F23G2203/401 (EP,US);
F23G2207/101 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Rauchverbrennungsanlage | [1987/37] | English: | Fume burning system | [1987/37] | French: | Système de combustion des fumées | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 24.12.1986 | Examination requested [1987/37] | 05.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP82102435.3 / EP0064589 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/01] | Request for further processing for: | 05.02.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.02.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2965051 (JAMES KOCEE); | [A]US3658482 (EVANS MARVIN, et al); | [A]US3875874 (ALTMANN BERTON G) |