EP0236559 - Method and apparatus of treating photoresists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USHIO DENKI Asahi-Tokai Building 19 No. 6-1, 2-chome Ote-machi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100 / JP | [1987/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Shinji USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Arai, Tesuji USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Ohno, Kuniharu USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ueki, Kazuyoshi USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 05 /
Mimura, Yoshiki USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 06 /
Tanaka, Kazuya USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 07 /
Sugioka, Shinji USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | 08 /
Suzuki, Hiroko USHIO DENKI 6409 Motoishikawa-cho Midori-ku Yokohama-shi kanagawa-ken / JP | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Betten, Jürgen Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/38] | Betten, Jürgen Dipl.-Ing. Betten & Gleiss Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-8000 München 5 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116309.5 | 25.11.1986 | [1987/38] | Priority number, date | JP19860053626 | 13.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5362686 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0236559 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0236559 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0236559 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/26 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
G03F7/2024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1987/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Photolackverarbeitung | [1987/38] | English: | Method and apparatus of treating photoresists | [1987/38] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour le traitement des photoréserves | [1987/38] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/42] | 25.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2143961 (FUSION SEMICONDUCTOR SYSTEMS) | [X] - JOURNAL OF THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 29, no. 6, June 1982, pages 1379-1381; R. ALLEN et al.: "Deep U.V. hardening of positive photoresist patterns" | [X] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, vol. 27, no. 7, July 1984, pages 45-46, Port Washington, New York, US; "Photoresist stabilization system" | [A] - MICROELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 3, nos. 1/4, December 1985, pages 329-337, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V. (North-Holland), Amsterdam, NL; A. GUTMANN et al.: "Thermal stability and etching resistance of formaldehyde- and deep UV-hardened photoresists" |