EP0235372 - Infrared ray detector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.01.1993 [1993/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 26-10, Tenjin 2-chome Nagaokakyo-shi Kyoto-fu 226 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Masuda, Noboru 17-18 Nishiaoki 1-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Tomaki, Kenji Ayameso, 389 Todehon-cho 2-chome Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Oosawa, Tetsuo 2-1219, Oji-5-chome-danchi 2 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Murata, Michihiro 4-8, Ooharanonishitakenosato-cho 1-chome Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [1988/08] |
Former [1987/37] | 01 /
Masuda, Noboru 17-18 Nishiaoki 1-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Tomaki, Kenji Ayameso, 389 Todehon-cho 2-chome Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Oosawa, Tetsu 2-1219, Oji-5-chome-danchi 2 Oji 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Murata, Michihiro 4-8, Ooharanonishitakenosato-cho 1-chome Nishikyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116444.0 | 26.11.1986 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | JP19860029827 | 12.02.1986 Original published format: JP 2982786 | JP19860054398 | 11.03.1986 Original published format: JP 5439886 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0235372 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0235372 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235372 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/18 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
G08B13/19 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1987/37] | Title | German: | Infraroter Strahldetektor | [1987/37] | English: | Infrared ray detector | [1987/37] | French: | Détecteur de rayon infrarouge | [1987/37] | Examination procedure | 30.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 27.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0080114 ; | [A]US3760399 ; | [A]GB2047886 ; | [A]US4245217 |