EP0229932 - High-capacity memory for multiprocessor systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. Viale Maresciallo Pilsudski, 92 00197 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1995/18] | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. Viale Maresciallo Pilsudski, 92 I-00197 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states ELSAG BAILEY S.p.A. Via G. Puccini, 2 I-16154 Genova-Sestri Ponente / IT | ||
Former [1987/31] | For all designated states ELETTRONICA SAN GIORGIO- ELSAG S.p.A. Via G. Puccini, 2 I-16154 Genova-Sestri / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbagelata, Giuseppe Viale Pio VII, 44/16 I-16148 Genova / IT | 02 /
Conterno, Bruno Via Dei Carpentiere 5/2 I-16159 Genova-Rivarolo / IT | 03 /
Pesce, Fernando Via S. Muscola 60/20 I-16153 Genova-Sestri / IT | [1987/31] | Representative(s) | Prato, Roberto, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/31] | Prato, Roberto, et al STUDIO TORTA Società Semplice Via Viotti 9 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 86116470.5 | 27.11.1986 | [1987/31] | Priority number, date | IT19850068044 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: IT 6804485 | [1987/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229932 | Date: | 29.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229932 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229932 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02, G06F15/16 | [1987/31] | CPC: |
G06F12/1483 (EP,US);
G06F12/0284 (EP,US);
G06F12/0292 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1987/31] | Title | German: | Hochkapazitätsspeicher für Multiprozessorsystem | [1987/31] | English: | High-capacity memory for multiprocessor systems | [1987/31] | French: | Mémoire de grande capacité pour systèmes multiprocesseurs | [1987/31] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3555513 (HAUCK ERWIN A, et al); | [A]US3914747 (BARNES ELWOOD EUGENE, et al); | [X]US4403283 (MYNTTI JON N [US], et al) | [X] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE FALL JOINT COMPUTER CONFERENCE, Anaheim, California, 5th-7th December 1972, vol. 41, part I,II, pages 765-777, Afips Press, New York, US; W.A. WULF et al.: "C.mmp - A multi-mini-processor" |