EP0232491 - Process for the hydrogenation of coal/mineral oil mixtures [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 13.04.1994 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinbraun Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 41 08 80 D-50868 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/01] | For all designated states RHEINBRAUN Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 41 08 80 D-50868 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states Rheinische Braunkohlenwerke AG. Stüttgenweg 2 D-5000 Köln 41 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giehr, Axel, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Zeisigweg. 1 D-5047 Wesseling / DE | 02 /
Hammer, Hartmut, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Leyboldstrasse 21 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | 03 /
Wawrzinek, Joachim Thorrer Strasse 60 D-5010 Bergheim 3 / DE | 04 /
Scharf, Hans-Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Dipl.-Ing. Margaretenstrasse 2 D-5040 Brühl / DE | 05 /
Lenz, Uwe, Dr. rer. nat. Dipl.-Chem. Heideweg 7 D-5020 Frechen / DE | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Koepsell, Helmut Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Koepsell, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Mittelstrasse 7 D-50672 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116589.2 | 28.11.1986 | [1987/34] | Priority number, date | DE19853543240 | 06.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543240 | [1987/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232491 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232491 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C10G1/06 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
C10G1/086 (EP);
B01J21/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, LU, NL [1987/34] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren zur hydrierenden Behandlung von Kohle/Mineralöl-Gemischen | [1987/34] | English: | Process for the hydrogenation of coal/mineral oil mixtures | [1987/34] | French: | Procédé pour l'hydrogénation de mélanges charbon/huiles minérales | [1987/34] | Examination procedure | 17.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 17.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
31.03.1992
16.04.1992
ADMISSIBLE VEBA OEL Technologie GmbH Johannastrasse 2-8 D-45899 Gelsenkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Lindner, Wolfgang Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse 45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
31.03.1992
16.04.1992
ADMISSIBLE VEBA OEL Technologie GmbH Johannastrasse 2-8 D-45899 Gelsenkirchen / DE Opponent's representative Lindner, Wolfgang, Dr. Alexander-von-Humboldt-Strasse D-45896 Gelsenkirchen / DE | 15.05.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.10.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.12.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1994/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 28.11.1991 | BE | 30.11.1991 | LU | 30.11.1991 | NL | 01.06.1992 | FR | 31.07.1992 | [1999/52] |
Former [1993/13] | GB | 28.11.1991 | |
BE | 30.11.1991 | ||
NL | 01.06.1992 | ||
FR | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1993/11] | BE | 30.11.1991 | |
NL | 01.06.1992 | ||
FR | 31.07.1992 | ||
Former [1992/48] | BE | 30.11.1991 | |
NL | 01.06.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | US4486293 [ ] (GARG DIWAKAR [US]); | US4325800 [ ] (ROSENTHAL JOEL W, et al) |