EP0229281 - Illuminated box for slides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.11.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hinrichs Fotowerbung GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 21 D-49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/17] | For all designated states Hinrichs Fotowerbung GmbH Raiffeisenstrasse 21 D-49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | ||
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states Hinrichs Fotowerbung GmbH + Co. KG Raiffeisenstrasse 21 D-4504 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hinrichs, Peter Fliederkamp 10 D-4500 Osnabrück / DE | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Busse & Busse Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 12 26 49002 Osnabrück / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Busse & Busse Patentanwälte Postfach 12 26 D-49002 Osnabrück / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116631.2 | 29.11.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | DE19863600588 | 11.01.1986 Original published format: DE 3600588 | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229281 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229281 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/10, // G02B27/02 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
G09F13/10 (EP);
G02B27/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/30] | Title | German: | Leuchtkasten für Diapositive | [1987/30] | English: | Illuminated box for slides | [1987/30] | French: | Visionneuse illuminée de diapositives | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 08.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 22.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1513151 (MOUNT BISHOP WILLIAM); | [A]FR2293019 (CRESPO NORBERT [FR]); | [A]FR2376431 (HAMON JEAN PIERRE [FR]); | [Y]US4185407 (LAMB JACK W [US]); | [A]EP0016589 (COSTA DANIEL DOMINIC); | [Y]GB2050665 (POWER DISPLAY EQUIPMENT LTD) |