EP0226891 - Method of manufacturing an electromagnetic relay without adjusting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 30.10.1991 [1991/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kimpel, Rolf-Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Mellener Strasse 28 D-1000 Berlin 49 / DE | 02 /
Schweiger, Josef Becherstrasse 1b D-8000 München 21 / DE | [1987/27] | Application number, filing date | 86116738.5 | 02.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | DE19853543099 | 05.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543099 | [1987/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226891 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226891 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01H49/00 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
H01H49/00 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4902 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur justierfreien Herstellung eines elektromagnetischen Relais | [1987/27] | English: | Method of manufacturing an electromagnetic relay without adjusting | [1987/27] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un relais électromagnétique sans réglage | [1987/27] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 03.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 26.09.1990 | SE | 26.09.1990 | [1991/44] |
Former [1991/27] | SE | 26.09.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4058783 (REUTING HANS-WERNER); | [A]EP0140285 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |