EP0227974 - A device for opening and closing a vehicle top [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASMO CO., LTD. 390 Umeda Kosai-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | For all designated states MAZDA Co., Ltd. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states ASMO CO., LTD. 390 Umeda Kosai-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states MAZDA Co., Ltd. 3-1, Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handa, Noboru Kosai Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Takahiko Yuto-cho Hamana-gun Shizuoka / JP | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [1987/28] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116826.8 | 03.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | JP19850272138 | 03.12.1985 Original published format: JP 27213885 | JP19860146710 | 23.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14671086 | JP19860146711 | 23.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14671186 | JP19860146712 | 23.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14671286 | JP19860146713 | 23.06.1986 Original published format: JP 14671386 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227974 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227974 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227974 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/12, G05D13/62 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
B60J7/0573 (EP);
B60J7/1273 (EP);
H02P5/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/28] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Öffnen und Schliessen eines beweglichen Kraftfahrzeugdaches | [1987/28] | English: | A device for opening and closing a vehicle top | [1987/28] | French: | Dispositif d'ouverture et de fermeture d'un toit ouvrant de véhicule automobile | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 28.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 11.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3116087 ; | [Y]GB1522822 ; | [Y]US4093851 ; | [A]US2692162 ; | [A]GB2120427 |