EP0226131 - Snow chain for vehicle wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOTYP S.A. Case Postale 53 Route de Lausanne CH-1037 Etagnières / CH | [1987/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ilon, Bengt Erland Schädrütihalde 4 CH-6006 Luzern / CH | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Gartenstrasse 28 A 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Rottmann, Maximilian Rottmann, Zimmermann + Partner AG Glattalstrasse 37 8052 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1987/26] | Rottmann, Maximilian R. c/o Rottmann, Quehl & Zimmermann AG Glattalstrasse 37 CH-8052 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86116832.6 | 03.12.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | DE19853545529 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3545529 | [1987/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226131 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226131 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226131 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B60C27/06, B60C27/20 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
B60C27/14 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2119 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49876 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/26] | B60C27/06, B60C27/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/26] | Title | German: | Schneekette für Fahrzeugräder | [1987/26] | English: | Snow chain for vehicle wheels | [1987/26] | French: | Chaîne anti-neige pour roues de véhicule | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 09.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/02] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE545151 [ ] (GUSTAF HENNING BORG); | US4388754 [ ] (ILON BENGT E [CH]) |