EP0226901 - Process for making contact bands on substrates, especially on panes, and panes made by this process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1991 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25, Postfach 1555 D-63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/38] | For all designated states LEYBOLD AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wilhelm-Rohn-Strasse 25, Postfach 1555 D-63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states Leybold-Heraeus GmbH Bonner Strasse 498 Postfach 51 07 60 D-5000 Köln 51 / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dietrich, Anton, Dr. Heilbrunn 16 D-8441 Wiesenfelden / DE | 02 /
Hartig, Klaus, Dr. Hanauerstrasse 17 D-6451 Ronneburg 2 / DE | 03 /
Schaefer, Hans-Christian, Dr. Obermühlenweg 12 D-6456 Langenselbold / DE | 04 /
Szczyrbowski, Joachim, Dr. Ringofenstrasse 5 D-8758 Goldbach / DE | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Zapfe, Hans Patentanwalt Postfach 20 01 51 63136 Heusenstamm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Zapfe, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Postfach 20 01 51 D-63136 Heusenstamm / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116846.6 | 03.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | DE19853543694 | 11.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543694 | [1987/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226901 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226901 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/36, H05B3/26 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
B32B17/10761 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3613 (EP,US);
C03C17/3644 (EP,US);
C03C17/3655 (EP,US);
C03C17/3673 (EP,US);
C03C17/3681 (EP,US);
H05B3/84 (EP,US);
H05B3/86 (EP,US);
H05B2203/013 (EP,US);
H05B2203/016 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12597 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12611 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von Kontaktbahnen auf Substraten, insbesondere auf Scheiben, und durch das Verfahren hergestellte Scheiben | [1987/27] | English: | Process for making contact bands on substrates, especially on panes, and panes made by this process | [1987/27] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de bandes de contact, en particulier sur des vitres et vitres ainsi obtenues | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 09.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 07.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 19.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 30.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4010304 [ ] (COHEN SABATINO); | [X]US4010204 (KOSTER ROLAND, et al); | [AD]EP0104870 (PILKINGTON BROTHERS PLC [GB]); | [AD]EP0035906 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [A]US3053698 (OGLE JR JAMES C, et al); | [A]DE1088198 (LIBBEY OWENS FORD GLASS CO); | [A]DE2227238 (GLAS & SPIEGEL MANUFACTUR AG); | [A]GB826754 (GEORGE EDWARD FOLKES) |