EP0229297 - Vibrating polishing machine with ring trough [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Kurt Walther GmbH & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 43-51 Postfach 11 06 42 42306 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states Carl Kurt Walther GmbH & Co. KG Bahnstrasse 43-51 Postfach 11 06 42 D-42306 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mehnert, Volker Deichselbach 25 D-5820 Gevelsberg 14 / DE | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Postfach 11 04 51 42304 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr., et al Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51 D-42304 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 86116975.3 | 06.12.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | DE19860000583U | 13.01.1986 Original published format: DE 8600583 U | [1987/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0229297 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0229297 | Date: | 28.06.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229297 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24B31/16 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
B24B31/073 (EP);
B24B31/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/37] |
Former [1987/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Ringtrog-Vibrationsgleitmaschine | [1987/30] | English: | Vibrating polishing machine with ring trough | [1987/30] | French: | Polisseuse vibrante à bac annulaire | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, ES, GR, IT, LU, NL, SE | 14.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 11.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.01.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | ES   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | GR   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 13.01.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE3147046 [ ]; | DE2425093 [ ]; | US4301625 [ ]; | GB2050883 [ ] |