EP0227988 - Therapeutic system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 55216 Ingelheim / DE | For:GB
Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Postfach 200 55218 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:GB
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GmbH Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | |||
Former [1987/28] | For:BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
LU
NL
SE
AT
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG Postfach 200 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:GB
BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GmbH D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brantl, Victor, Dr. med. Matthias-Claudius-Strasse 9 D-6200 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Häselbarth, Volkmar, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Im Hippel 53 D-6535 Gau-Algesheim / DE | 03 /
Zierenberg, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Goethestrasse 1 D-6530 Bingen/Rhein / DE | [1987/28] | Application number, filing date | 86117109.8 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | DE19853544311 | 14.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3544311 | [1987/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227988 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227988 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/03, A61K31/55 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
A61K9/7061 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (KR);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/28] | A61L15/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Therapeutisches System | [1987/28] | English: | Therapeutic system | [1987/28] | French: | Système thérapeutique | [1987/28] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 18.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/07] | 09.08.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE2040510 (THOMAE GMBH DR K); | [AD]DE2836387 (BOEHRINGER SOHN INGELHEIM); | [A]EP0086997 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM KG [DE]); | [A]GB2141025 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO); | [E]EP0170193 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM VETMED [DE]) |