EP0226186 - Storage case for compact discs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states idn inventions and development of novelties ag Hartbertstrasse 9 CH-7002 Chur / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1987/26] | For all designated states idn inventions and development of novelties ag Hartbertstrasse 9 CH-7002 Chur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ackeret, Peter Allmendstrasse 18 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | [1987/26] | Representative(s) | Sparing Röhl Henseler Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1987/26] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte Rethelstrasse 123 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117291.4 | 11.12.1986 | [1987/26] | Priority number, date | DE19853545163 | 20.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3545163 | [1987/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0226186 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0226186 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0226186 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/04 | [1987/26] | CPC: |
G11B33/0444 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1987/26] | Title | German: | Aufbewahrungsbehälter für Compactdisks | [1987/26] | English: | Storage case for compact discs | [1987/26] | French: | Récipient de stockage pour disques compacts | [1987/26] | Examination procedure | 29.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/43] | 26.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0163221 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]); | [Y]EP0141113 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]); | [A]EP0141937 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]); | [A]EP0092666 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]); | [A]EP0132533 (FISCHER ARTUR FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [AP]WO8603877 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]); | [AD]EP0139161 (IDN INVENTION DEV NOVELTIES [CH]) | Examination | FR685404 |