EP0229337 - Sheet positioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | For all designated states PPG INDUSTRIES, INC. One PPG Place Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15272 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Robert George 5001 Northlawn Drive Murrysville Pa. 15668 / US | 02 /
Fecik, Michael Timothy 5140 Janie Drive Pittsburgh Pa. 15227 / US | 03 /
Pavlik, Joseph Charles Box 385 RD No.1 Natrona Heights Pa.15065 / US | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, et al Patentanwälte Sternagel & Fleischer Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dr. Michael Hann Dr. H.-G. Sternagel Sander Aue 30 D-51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117366.4 | 12.12.1986 | [1987/30] | Priority number, date | US19850810615 | 19.12.1985 Original published format: US 810615 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229337 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0229337 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C03B23/03, C03B35/20 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
C03B23/0302 (EP,US);
C03B23/03 (EP,US);
C03B35/14 (EP,US);
C03B35/145 (EP,US);
C03B35/202 (EP,US);
C03B2225/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1987/30] | Title | German: | Scheibenpositionierungssystem | [1987/30] | English: | Sheet positioning system | [1987/30] | French: | Système de positionnement de feuille | [1987/30] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/51] | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3523783 (CLARK HAROLD W, et al); | [A]US3713799 (MC MASTER H); | [A]US3992182 (FRANK ROBERT G); | [AD]US4204853 (SEYMOUR SAMUEL L [US]); | [A]EP0067509 (NITSCHKE JOHN STEPHEN); | [A]EP0103421 (NITSCHKE JOHN STEPHEN) |