EP0228021 - Improvements to digital phase-locked loop circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Turin / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states CSELT Centro Studi e Laboratori Telecomunicazioni S.p.A. Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Turin / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mogavero Bruno, Carlo Via Guido Reni, 96/84 Turin / IT | 02 /
Ambrosio, Renato Via Trotta, 17 San Raffaele Cimena (TO) / IT | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Riederer Freiherr von Paar, Anton, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Kanzlei Landshut Postfach 26 64 84010 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Riederer Freiherr von Paar zu Schönau, Anton, et al Van der Werth, Lederer & Riederer Postfach 2664 D-84010 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117500.8 | 16.12.1986 | [1987/28] | Priority number, date | IT19850068061 | 17.12.1985 Original published format: IT 6806185 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228021 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228021 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0228021 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/033 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
H04L7/0331 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/28] | H04L7/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | Digitale phasenverriegelte Schleifenschaltungen | [1987/28] | English: | Improvements to digital phase-locked loop circuits | [1987/28] | French: | Circuits de boucle de verrouillage de phase numérique | [1987/28] | Examination procedure | 08.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 30.03.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4280099 (RATTLINGOURD GLEN D); | [A]US4466111 (BENNETT JAMES F [US]); | [A]WO8504775 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) |