EP0242447 - Anti-panelling container closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TBL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 128 Passaic Avenue Livingston New Jersey 07039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/44] | For all designated states TBL DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 128 Passaic Avenue Livingston New Jersey 07039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Towns, Edward J. 40 Karen Way Summit New Jersey / US | 02 /
Brown, Edward M. 128 Passaic Avenue Livingston New Jersey 07039 / US | [1987/44] | Representative(s) | Abitz, Walter, et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/02] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/44] | Abitz, Walter, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwälte Abitz & Partner Postfach 86 01 09 D-81628 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86117881.2 | 22.12.1986 | [1987/44] | Priority number, date | US19860853769 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: US 853769 | [1987/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0242447 | Date: | 28.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B65D51/16 | [1987/44] | CPC: |
B65D51/1661 (EP,US);
B65D41/04 (KR);
B65D41/0435 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/44] | Title | German: | Verformungsfester Verschlussdeckel für Behälter | [1987/44] | English: | Anti-panelling container closure | [1987/44] | French: | Fermeture empêchant la concavité des parois d'un récipient | [1987/44] | File destroyed: | 22.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 29.04.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/50] | 25.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB279723 (HANS ERNST, et al); | [X]GB917300 (HARRY JOCK FREESTONE); | [Y]US3679089 (SWETT JAMES B, et al); | [Y]US4036386 (NISHIOKA MASATO, et al) |