EP0234045 - A pyrazole oxime derivative and its production and use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD. 1-2-5, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo100-0027 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | For all designated states NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD. 1-2-5, Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hamaguchi, Hiroshi Rose Manshon Fujinomori A-804 Rose Manshon Fujinomori A-804, 10-1 Fukakusa-Hottacho, Fushimi-ku, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Takaishi, Hideo 7-20, Nigawa-Yurinocho Nishinomiya-shi / JP | 03 /
Ohshima, Tetsuji 7-20, Nigawa-Yurinocho Nishinomiya-shi / JP | 04 /
Konno, Takamichi 3121 A, Aileen Dr. Raleigh NC 27606 / US | 05 /
Miyagi, Yukio 7-23-816, Nankonaka-4-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka / JP | 06 /
Shiraiwa, Yutaka 521-3, Kusabe Saikai-shi / JP | 07 /
Akita, Takayuki 2038-29, Murakami Yachiyo-shi / JP | [1992/36] |
Former [1987/36] | 01 /
Hamaguchi, Hiroshi Rose Manshon Fujinomori A-804 10-1, Fukakusa-Hottacho Fushimi-ku Kyoto / JP | ||
02 /
Takaishi, Hideo 7-20, Nigawa-Yurinocho Nishinomiya-shi / JP | |||
03 /
Ohshima, Tetsuji 7-20, Nigawa-Yurinocho Nishinomiya-shi / JP | |||
04 /
Konno, Takamichi 3121 A, Aileen Dr. Raleigh NC 27606 / US | |||
05 /
Miyagi, Yukio 7-23-816, Nankonaka-4-chome Suminoe-ku Osaka / JP | |||
06 /
Shiraiwa, Yutaka 521-3, Kusabe Saikai-shi / JP | |||
07 /
Akita, Takayuki 2038-29, Murakami Yachiyo-shi / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/36] | Patentanwälte Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Partner Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86118020.6 | 23.12.1986 | [1987/36] | Priority number, date | JP19850295759 | 27.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29575985 | JP19850295760 | 27.12.1985 Original published format: JP 29576085 | JP19860026582 | 08.02.1986 Original published format: JP 2658286 | JP19860151187 | 27.06.1986 Original published format: JP 15118786 | JP19860177447 | 28.07.1986 Original published format: JP 17744786 | JP19860206442 | 02.09.1986 Original published format: JP 20644286 | JP19860206993 | 03.09.1986 Original published format: JP 20699386 | [1987/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0234045 | Date: | 02.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0234045 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0234045 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/20, C07D231/18, C07D231/22, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D401/12, A01N43/16, C07F7/18, C07F7/08, C07D231/00 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
C07D231/18 (EP,KR);
A01N43/56 (EP);
C07D231/20 (EP);
C07D231/22 (EP);
C07D405/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1987/36] | C07D231/20, C07D231/18, C07D405/12, C07D409/12, C07D413/12, C07D401/12, C07D231/22 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/36] | Title | German: | Pyrazol-oxim-Derivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Anwendung | [1987/36] | English: | A pyrazole oxime derivative and its production and use | [1987/36] | French: | Dérivé de pyrazole oxime et procédé de préparation et application | [1987/36] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/40] | 05.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4477462 (AOYAGI EDWARD I [US]) |