EP0228704 - Device for manual wiring of electronic circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIRCUITGRAPH, S.L. 4, Nunez Morgado Street E-28036 Madrid / ES | [1987/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Valenciano Melero, Pedro 27, Marqués de Lozoya Street ES-28007 Madrid / ES | [1987/29] | Representative(s) | Gossel, Hans K., et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/29] | Gossel, Hans K., Dipl.-Ing. Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel, et al Widenmayerstrasse 23 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86118062.8 | 24.12.1986 | [1987/29] | Priority number, date | ES19850291343U | 27.12.1985 Original published format: ES 291343 U | [1987/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0228704 | Date: | 15.07.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0228704 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/06 | [1987/29] | CPC: |
H05K13/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die von Hand durchgeführte Verkabelung elektronischer Kreisläufe | [1987/29] | English: | Device for manual wiring of electronic circuits | [1987/29] | French: | Dispositif de câblage manuel de circuits électroniques | [1987/29] | File destroyed: | 26.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 04.07.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/51] | 28.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB908141 (ERICSSON TELEPHONES LTD); | [A]DE2504121 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]GB2084112 (BRINE TERENCE JOHN) | [A] - ELECTRONICS vol. 54, no. 13, Juni 1981New York Seite 154 & production : TOOL KEEPS TRACK OF WRAPPED TURNS" |