EP0188295 - A loudspeaker unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lyngdorf, Johan Peter Arnakvej 8 DK-8270 Höjbjerg / DK | [1986/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/30] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 NL-2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | ||
Former [1986/30] | Urbanus, Henricus Maria, Ir. c/o Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 107 NL-2587 BP 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 86200008.0 | 03.01.1986 | [1986/30] | Priority number, date | DK19850000026 | 03.01.1985 Original published format: DK 2685 | [1986/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0188295 | Date: | 23.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0188295 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H04R1/28, H04R1/22 | [1986/30] | CPC: |
H04R1/2819 (EP,US);
H04R1/227 (EP,US);
H04R1/2842 (EP,US);
H04R1/2888 (EP,US);
H04R2209/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1986/30] | Title | German: | Lautsprechereinheit | [1986/30] | English: | A loudspeaker unit | [1986/30] | French: | Unité de haut-parleur | [1986/30] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/15] | 22.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 05.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2405608 (MILOT GILLES [FR]); | [Y]US4213008 (HELFFRICH EDMUND R [US]); | [A]DE2837520 (SCHUSTER HARALD); | [AP]EP0158978 (QUAAS JUERGEN [DE]) |