EP0193979 - Process for the elimination of nitrates by a microbiological conversion in the presence of gaseous hydrogen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.1989 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACEC, Société Anonyme Avenue Lloyd George 7 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [1988/01] |
Former [1986/37] | For all designated states ATELIERS DE CONSTRUCTIONS ELECTRIQUES DE CHARLEROI (ACEC) Société Anonyme Avenue Lloyd George 7 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verstraete, Willy, Prof. Dr.ir. Rijksuniversiteit Gent Coupure Links 653 B-9000 Gent / BE | 02 /
De Ley, Jozef, Prof. Dr. Rijksuniversiteit Gent Ledeganckstraat 35 B-9000 Gent / BE | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Bossard, Franz 288, rue de Jamioulx B-6110 Montigny-le-Tilleul / BE | [1989/21] |
Former [1986/37] | Bossard, Franz ACEC - Service des Brevets Boîte Postale 4 B-6000 Charleroi / BE | Application number, filing date | 86200211.0 | 14.02.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | EP19850200249 | 25.02.1985 Original published format: EP 85200249 | [1986/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193979 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193979 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30, C02F3/34 | [1986/37] | CPC: |
C02F3/302 (EP,US);
C02F3/28 (KR);
C02F3/2806 (EP,US);
C02F3/34 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Beseitigung von Nitraten durch eine mikrobiologische Konversion in Anwesenheit von gasförmigem Wasserstoff | [1986/37] | English: | Process for the elimination of nitrates by a microbiological conversion in the presence of gaseous hydrogen | [1986/37] | French: | Procédé d'élimination de nitrates au moyen d'une conversion micro-biologique en présence d'hydrogène gazeux | [1986/37] | File destroyed: | 11.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 06.03.1987 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 01.07.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0065035 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [Y]FR2476629 (DEGREMONT SA [FR]); | [A]FR2336354 (BAENSCH TETRA WERKE [DE]); | [A]FR2475030 (CELANESE CORP [US]); | [A]EP0086863 (SULZER AG [CH]); | [A]FR2358362 (VERDE LUIGI [IT]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 103, no. 1, 8 juillet 1985, page 322, résumé no. 3490r, Columbus, Ohio, US; D. ROEMERMANN et al.: "Denitrification by alcaligenes eutrophus is plasmid dependent", & J. BACTERIOL. 1985, 162(2)852-4 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 5, 4 août 1980, résumé no. 43917s, Columbus, Ohio, US; S. SUZUKI et al.: "Biochemical energy conversion using immobilized whole cells of Clostridium butyricum", & BIOCHIMIE 1980, 62(5-6)353-8 |