EP0222419 - Process for quantifying labile glycosylated hemoglobin and glycemia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUTO DE BIOINGENIERIA, FUNDACION CARLOS GARCIA-MONZON General Rodrigo Street 6 E-28003 Madrid / ES | [1987/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
De La Quintana, Joaquin Bustelo Avda. de la Marina 3-5 Cadiz / ES | [1987/21] | Representative(s) | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents Rue de Livourne 7, B.1 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents Rue de Livourne 7, B.1 B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | ||
Former [1987/21] | Modrie, Guy Cabinet Vigneron Avenue G. De Longueville, 22 Bte 7-14 B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 86200311.8 | 28.02.1986 | [1987/21] | Priority number, date | ES19850548890 | 14.11.1985 Original published format: ES 548890 | [1987/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0222419 | Date: | 20.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0222419 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, // G01N33/72 | [1987/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/1455 (EP);
A61B5/14532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung von labilem glycosyliertem Hämoglobin und Glykämie | [1987/21] | English: | Process for quantifying labile glycosylated hemoglobin and glycemia | [1987/21] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer de la hémoglobine gycosylée labile et la glycémie | [1987/21] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 16.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/41] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/41] | 02.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2022821 ; | [Y]US3922088 ; | [A]EP0072185 ; | [A]EP0003015 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 3, 20th July 1981, page 309, column 2, abstract no. 20691r, Columbus, Ohio, US; H.R. FIGULLA et al.: "A new non-invasive technique for measuring oxygen-saturations of hemoglobin using wavelength distances and its application to human and animal skin transplants", & ADV. PHYSIOL. SCI., PROC. INT. CONGR., 28th 1980, 25 (Oxygen Transp. Tissue) 317-318 | [A] - CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 31, no. 2, February 1985, pages 213-216, Winston-Salem, North Carolina, US; R.R. LITTLE et al.: "Measurement of glycosylated whole-blood protein for assessing glucose control in diabetes: Collection and storage of capillary blood on filter paper" |