EP0196705 - A method of effecting high contrast development of a image-wise exposed photographic silver halide emulsion layer material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.1989 [1989/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/41] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT naamloze vennootschap Septestraat 27 B-2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ooms, Richard Alfons Vredestraat 14 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | 02 /
Pollet, Robert Joseph Broechemsteenweg 115 B-2531 Vremde / BE | [1986/41] | Application number, filing date | 86200425.6 | 18.03.1986 | [1986/41] | Priority number, date | EP19850200464 | 26.03.1985 Original published format: EP 85200464 | [1986/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0196705 | Date: | 08.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0196705 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03C5/30 | [1986/41] | CPC: |
G03C5/305 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1986/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Durchführung der kontrastreichen Entwicklung eines bildmäsig belichteten photographischen Silberhalogenidemulsionsschichtmaterials | [1986/41] | English: | A method of effecting high contrast development of a image-wise exposed photographic silver halide emulsion layer material | [1986/41] | French: | Méthode pour effectuer le développement contrasté d'un matériau photographique à couche d'émulsion à l'halogénure d'argent exposé sous forme d'image | [1986/41] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 27.08.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB949644 (GEVAERT PHOTO PROD NV); | [AD]FR2125325 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]); | [AD]GB2010514 (DU PONT) | Examination | EP0164120 |