EP0201114 - Process for the manufacture of polyester industrial yarn and cord made from said yarn and elastomeric objects reinforced with said cord [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.08.1995 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/19] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1986/46] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feijen, Henricus Hubertus Wilhelmus Hogeweg 14 NL-6881 EC Velp / NL | 02 /
Weigand, Karl Ado Egginkskamp 13 NL-7211 CW Eefde / NL | [1986/46] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19 - 21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Fett, Günter Akzo Patente GmbH, Postfach 10 01 49 D-42097 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [1986/46] | Sieders, René AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 86200494.2 | 24.03.1986 | [1986/46] | Priority number, date | NL19850001019 | 04.04.1985 Original published format: NL 8501019 | [1986/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0201114 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0201114 | Date: | 04.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0201114 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/30] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0201114 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/62, D02G3/48, D01F8/14, D01D5/34, B60C9/00 | [1986/46] | CPC: |
B60C9/0042 (EP,US);
D02G3/48 (KR);
D01D5/34 (EP,US);
D01F6/62 (EP,US);
D01F8/14 (EP,US);
Y10S264/26 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines industriellen Polyestergarns und daraus hergestelltes Tau und mit diesem Tau verstärkte elastomere Gegenstände | [1986/46] | English: | Process for the manufacture of polyester industrial yarn and cord made from said yarn and elastomeric objects reinforced with said cord | [1986/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de fil industriel de polyester et câblé fabriqué au moyen de ce fil et objets élastomères renforcés avec ce câblé | [1986/46] | Examination procedure | 11.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 03.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
10.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.04.1991
10.06.1991
ADMISSIBLE HOECHST Aktiengesellschaft Zentrale Patentabteilung Postfach 80 03 20 D-65903 Frankfurt / DE | 19.06.1991 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 09.10.1991 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.1991 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 28.02.1992 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 18.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 02.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.03.1995 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.03.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.04.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 07.07.1994 | Appeal received No. T0560/94 | 01.03.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1991/40] | FR | 14.12.1990 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP57149513 ; | [AD]FR1564427 ; | [AD]US4134882 (FRANKFORT HANS R E, et al); | [AD]EP0056667 (AKZO NV [NL]); | [A]EP0056963 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]DE3207826 (TOYO TIRE & RUBBER CO [JP]); | [AD]EP0080906 (TOYOBO PETCORD [JP]) | [AD] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 257 (C-140)[1135], 16th December 1982; & JP - A - 57 149 513 (TEIJIN K.K.) 16-09-1982, & JP57149513 A 00000000 | [AD] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 205 (C-185)[1350], 9th September 1983; JP - A - 58 104 221 (TEIJIN K.K.) 21-06-1983 |