EP0198537 - Method of manufacturing a plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.07.1991 [1991/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joosten, Henricus Christiaan Mathias INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Veenstra, Gustaaf, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 86200561.8 | 03.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | NL19850001064 | 11.04.1985 Original published format: NL 8501064 | [1986/43] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0198537 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198537 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R23/02 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
H01R24/38 (EP,US);
H01R24/00 (US);
H01R24/86 (EP,US);
H01R2107/00 (EP,US);
Y10S439/937 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49176 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/43] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren für Stecker | [1989/48] | English: | Method of manufacturing a plug | [1986/43] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un fiche | [1989/48] |
Former [1986/43] | Herstellungsverfahren für Verbinder | ||
Former [1986/43] | Méthode de fabrication d'un connecteur | File destroyed: | 12.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 16.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/25] | 31.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 03.04.1990 | [1991/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3831133 (GRUNDFEST M); | [A]FR87290E (DOLOISE METALLURGIQUE) |