EP0198546 - Access door for operator's cab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND, INC. (a Delaware corp.) 500 Diller Avenue New Holland Pennsylvania 17557 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/37] | For all designated states FORD NEW HOLLAND, INC. (a Delaware corp.) 500 Diller Avenue New Holland Pennsylvania 17557 / US | ||
Former [1986/43] | For all designated states NEW HOLLAND INC. 500, Diller Avenue New Holland Pennsylvania 17557 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hurlburt, Joseph C. 1829 Wilson Avenue Lancaster, PA 17603 / US | [1986/43] | Representative(s) | Vandenbroucke, Alberic New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1986/43] | Vandenbroucke, Alberic T.J. New Holland Belgium NV., Patent Department, Leon Claeysstraat, 3A B-8210 Zedelgem / BE | Application number, filing date | 86200605.3 | 10.04.1986 | [1986/43] | Priority number, date | US19850723426 | 15.04.1985 Original published format: US 723426 | [1986/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0198546 | Date: | 22.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0198546 | Date: | 08.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0198546 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B62D33/06, B60J5/04 | [1986/43] | CPC: |
B60J5/0487 (EP,US);
B60J5/0497 (EP,US);
B62D33/0617 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1986/43] | Title | German: | Zugangstür für Fahrerhaus | [1986/43] | English: | Access door for operator's cab | [1986/43] | French: | Porte d'accès pour cabine de conducteur | [1986/43] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/43] | 09.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/39] | Request for further processing for: | 09.01.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.02.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.10.1991 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 02.10.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2397951 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]); | [X]WO8100541 (MASSEY FERGUSON SERVICES NV [NL], et al); | [A]EP0065581 (DEERE & CO [US]) |