EP0212682 - Self-diagnosis device and process for a micro-computer control system for a motor-vehicle internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.06.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALFA LANCIA INDUSTRIALE S.p.A. Viale Alfa Romeo 20020 Arese (Milano) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/17] | For all designated states ALFA LANCIA INDUSTRIALE S.p.A. Viale Alfa Romeo I-20020 Arese Milan / IT | ||
Former [1987/40] | For all designated states ALFA LANCIA INDUSTRIALE S.r.l. Viale Alfa Romeo I-20020 Arese Milan / IT | ||
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states ALFA ROMEO AUTO S.p.A. Via Medina 40 I-80133 Napoli / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saglimbeni, Renato Via Giusti 25 I-20021 Bollate Milan / IT | 02 /
Casagrande, Daniele Via Bramante 7 I-20090 Cesano Boscone Milan / IT | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | De Carli, Erberto, et al ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86200662.4 | 18.04.1986 | [1987/10] | Priority number, date | IT19850020681 | 14.05.1985 Original published format: IT 2068185 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0212682 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/24, F02D41/22, F02D41/26, F02D41/28 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
F02D41/266 (EP,US);
F02D41/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1987/10] | Title | German: | Selbstdiagnoseverfahren und -vorrichtung für ein Mikrocomputersteuerungssystem eines Kraftfahrzeug-Innenverbrennungsmotors | [1987/10] | English: | Self-diagnosis device and process for a micro-computer control system for a motor-vehicle internal combustion engine | [1987/10] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour l'autodiagnostic d'un système de régulation à micro-ordinateur pour le moteur à combustion interne d'un véhicule | [1987/10] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 10.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 28.10.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1989/30] | 10.03.1989 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3919885 (KAIREIT MANFRED GUSTAV); | [A]US4325251 (KANEGAE HIDETOSHI); | [Y]US4339801 (HOSAKA AKIO, et al); | [Y]EP0065703 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0106743 (BENDIX CORP [US]); | [A]US4469065 (HASEGAWA SHUMPEI [JP], et al); | [A]FR2548274 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) |