EP0204359 - Radial spiral-groove bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.1990 [1990/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tielemans, Leonardus Petrus Maria c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Van Roemburg, Franciscus Maria Johannes c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1986/50] | Representative(s) | Melio, Jan Dirk, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1986/50] | Melio, Jan Dirk, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 86200811.7 | 09.05.1986 | [1986/50] | Priority number, date | NL19850001423 | 17.05.1985 Original published format: NL 8501423 | [1986/50] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0204359 | Date: | 10.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0204359 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/10 | [1986/50] | CPC: |
F16C33/107 (EP,US);
F16C17/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1986/50] | Title | German: | Radiales Spiralrillenlager | [1986/50] | English: | Radial spiral-groove bearing | [1986/50] | French: | Palier radial à rainures hélicoidales | [1986/50] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 28.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 11.10.1989 | [1990/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB270005 (THOMAS SLOPER); | [A]GB731435 (GLACIER CO LTD); | [A]FR2299552 (SKF IND TRADING & DEV [NL], et al); | [X]FR2353749 (SKF KUGELLAGERFABRIKEN GMBH [DE]) |