EP0208370 - Circuit arrangement for the operation of high pressure gas discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.02.1991 [1991/08] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:BE
FR
GB
NL
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/03] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
FR
GB
NL
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albach, Manfred, Dr. Hasbach 5 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Ralf, Dr. Büchel 34 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 03 /
Stormberg, Hans-Peter, Dr. Weissdornweg 52 D-5190 Stolberg / DE | 04 /
Wegener, Armin Kleinmarschierstrasse 61 D-5100 Aachen / DE | [1990/10] |
Former [1987/03] | 01 /
Albach, Manfred, Dr. Hasbach 5 D-5100 Aachen / DE | ||
02 /
Schäfer, Ralf, Dr. Büchel 34 D-5100 Aachen / DE | |||
03 /
Stormberg, Hans-Peter, Dr. weissdornweg 52 D-5190 Stolberg / DE | |||
04 /
Wegener, Armin Kleinmarschierstrasse 61 D-5100 Aachen / DE | Representative(s) | Peuckert, Hermann, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Peuckert, Hermann, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 D-22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1987/03] | Auer, Horst, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35 D-20097 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 86201134.3 | 27.06.1986 | [1987/03] | Priority number, date | DE19853524266 | 06.07.1985 Original published format: DE 3524266 | [1987/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208370 | Date: | 14.01.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208370 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/29 | [1987/03] | CPC: |
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
Y10S315/07 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1987/03] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum Betrieb von Hochdruckgasentladungslampen | [1987/03] | English: | Circuit arrangement for the operation of high pressure gas discharge lamps | [1987/03] | French: | Dispositif de circuit pour le fonctionnement de lampes de décharge à gaz à haute pression | [1987/03] | Examination procedure | 15.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/29] | 16.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2318444 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | DE2461449 [ ] (GEN ELECTRIC); | DE2652275 [ ] (BOEHRINGER ANDREAS); | DE2918314 [ ] (STEVENS CARLILE R); | US4346332 [ ] (WALDEN JOHN P); | EP0059053 [ ] (EMI PLC THORN [GB]); | EP0126556 [ ] (DUBANK ELECTRONIC [ZA]) |