EP0218268 - Dye laser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/27] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | ||
Former [1987/16] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hollins, Richard Charles 31 Gardens Walk Upton-on-Severn Worcester, WR8 0JW / GB | 02 /
Jordan, David Lesie 46 Longridge Road Malvern Worcester / GB | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Beckham, Robert William, et al D/IPR (DERA) Formalities Poplar 2 MoD Abbey Wood 19 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/16] | Beckham, Robert William, et al Defence Research Agency Intellectual Property Department DRA Farnborough Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86201391.9 | 07.08.1986 | [1987/16] | Priority number, date | GB19850020311 | 13.08.1985 Original published format: GB 8520311 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0218268 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0218268 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0218268 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/02, H01S3/08, H01S3/213, H01S3/106 | [1992/03] | CPC: |
H01S3/07 (EP,US);
H01S3/022 (EP,US);
H01S3/0826 (EP,US);
H01S3/08086 (EP,US);
H01S3/123 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/40] | H01S3/02, H01S3/08, H01S3/20, H01S3/106 | ||
Former IPC [1987/16] | H01S3/30, H01S3/106 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/16] | Title | German: | Farbstofflaser | [1987/16] | English: | Dye laser | [1987/16] | French: | Laser à colorant | [1987/16] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 30.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 26.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3753148 (BILLMAN K) | [A] - OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 24, no. 11, January 1978, pages 31-32; R. DORSINVILLE et al.: "Emission laser a deux longueurs d'onde accordables" | [A] - ELECTRONICS & COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 66, no. 11, November 1983, pages 120-126, Scripta Publishing Co., Silver Spring, Maryland, US; S. MUTO et al.: "Continuously tunable energy transfer laser operation in four-dye mixture systems" | [A] - OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, vol. 19, no. 1, October 1976, pages 5-6; C. KITTRELL et al.: "Simultaneous tunable two-wavelength operation of flashlamp pumped dye lasers" | [A] - APPLIED SPECTROSCOPY, vol. 30, no. 3, May/June 1976, pages 362-363; P.E. OETTINGER: "Flowing multi-dye laser cell" | [A] - APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 20, no. 20, October 1981, pages 3553-3556, Optical Society of America, New York, US; F. BOS: "Optimization of spectral coverage in an eight-cell oscillator-amplifier dye laser pumped at 308nm" |