EP0258498 - Apparatus for determining the groundspeed rate of an aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [1988/10] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707 Mail Stop 7E-25 Seattle Washington 98124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graupp, Frederick Gerald 13110 N.E. 177th Place Apt. 128 Woodenville WA 98072 / US | 02 /
van Leynseele, Francis Jacques 20146 - 80th Avenue, W. Edmonds, WA 98020 / US | [1988/10] | Representative(s) | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1988/10] | Hoijtink, Reinoud, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 86201503.9 | 01.09.1986 | [1988/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0258498 | Date: | 09.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/06, G01P5/00, G01P7/00 | [1988/10] | CPC: |
G05D1/063 (EP);
G01P5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bestimmung der Geschwindigkeitsänderung eines Flugzeuges | [1988/10] | English: | Apparatus for determining the groundspeed rate of an aircraft | [1988/10] | French: | Appareil pour déterminer la variation de vitesse sol d'un aéronef | [1988/10] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/39] | 30.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   16.11.1991 | 30.09.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1120327 (LTV AEROSPACE CORP); | [A]US4012713 (GREENE LEONARD M, et al); | [Y]FR2444275 (WESTLAND AIRCRAFT LTD [GB]); | [Y]DE3145389 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [Y]EP0125087 (SPERRY CORP [US]) |