EP0227155 - Device and method for separating manure and the further processing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.1991 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stegra Machinebouw B.V. Postbus 2001 NL-5202 CA Den Bosch / NL | [1987/52] |
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states Steggink, Marinus Gerhardus Jacob Obrechtstraat 22 NL-5216 GR 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steggink, Marinus Gerhardus Jacob Obrechtstraat 22 NL-5216 GR Den Bosch / NL | [1987/52] |
Former [1987/27] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, et al World Trade Center, P. Petersstraat 160 5612 LV Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1987/52] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir., et al World Trade Center, P. Petersstraat 160 NL-5612 LV Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1987/27] | Noz, Franciscus Xaverius, Ir. Algemeen Octrooibureau P.O. Box 645 NL-5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 86202136.7 | 02.12.1986 | [1987/27] | Priority number, date | NL19850003380 | 07.12.1985 Original published format: NL 8503380 | [1987/27] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0227155 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0227155 | Date: | 27.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01, A01C3/00, C05F3/06 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
A01C3/00 (EP);
A01K1/01 (EP);
A01K1/0103 (EP);
Y02A40/28 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/27] | A01K1/01, A01C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Scheiden von Dung und zur weiteren Verarbeitung davon | [1987/27] | English: | Device and method for separating manure and the further processing thereof | [1987/27] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la séparation du fumier et son traitement ultérieur | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/08] | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU695603 ; | [A]SU858682 ; | [X]SU672060 ; | [X]DE216377 ; | [A]DE483545 (ERNST GUSTAV BERENDT); | [A]DD203217 (TESCH MAX, et al); | [A]DD142287 (BILDT KARIN, et al); | [A]GB1148538 (GEOFFREY ANTHONY WRIGHT); | [A]GB1495772 (SAF SOC AGRICOLE FONCIERE); | [A]DE2943962 (KNEPPER HERMANN) | [X] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, section P, week C 27, August 13, 1980; & SU-A-695603 (SIBE CATTLE RES PLN), & SU695603 A 00000000 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, section P, week E 24, July 28, 1982; & SU-A-858682 (SZONE CAT BREED ME), & SU858682 A 00000000 | [X] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, section Ch, week C 11, April 23, 1980; & SU-A-672060 (NIIKERAMZIT KERAMZI), & SU672060 A 00000000 |