EP0225677 - Blown bag-in-box composite container and method and apparatus for making the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 28.07.1995 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/25] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCullough, Michael Jefferson 12 Cliffgate Lane Ft. Thomas, KY 41075 / US | 02 /
McKibben, Gary Eugene 9944 Shellbark Lane Cinti, OH 45231 / US | 03 /
Skidmore, John Edward 1223 Hogue Road Hamilton, OH 45013 / US | [1987/25] | Representative(s) | Engisch, Gautier, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Engisch, Gautier, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [1987/25] | Suslic, Lydia Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 86202209.2 | 09.12.1986 | [1987/25] | Priority number, date | US19850808587 | 13.12.1985 Original published format: US 808587 | [1987/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0225677 | Date: | 16.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0225677 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0225677 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0225677 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65D77/06, B29C49/24 | [1988/18] | CPC: |
B65D77/065 (EP,US);
B29C49/24 (EP,US);
B29C2793/00 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C49/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1987/25] | B65D77/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/25] | Title | German: | Aus einem geblasenen Beutel in einem Aussenkarton bestehender Zweistoffbehälter sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu seiner Herstellung | [1987/25] | English: | Blown bag-in-box composite container and method and apparatus for making the same | [1987/25] | French: | Récipient composite comportant une poche souple interne formée par soufflage et un récipient externe ainsi que procédé et appareil pour sa formation | [1987/25] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/05] | 09.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1992
03.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1992
03.12.1992
ADMISSIBLE Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1993/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.11.1992
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien TFP / Patentabteilung D-40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 18.01.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.07.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.09.1994 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.09.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 20.04.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 14.07.1995 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1996/28] | AT | 04.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2898972 (BERNARD STRONG); | [A]DE2915228 (HENKEL KGAA); | [X]EP0053715 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | [Y]EP0162727 (LANGSTON JONES & SAMUEL SMITH [GB]); | [Y]EP0189750 (HERRMANN HELGA MARGOT) | by applicant | US3363807 | US4174051 | US4214675 | US4322018 | US4342399 | US4355737 | US4358918 | US4386923 | US4484431 | US4524564 | US4524883 | US4550004 | EP0162727 | EP0189750 |