EP0187707 - An inflatable plug for a reactor vessel stud hole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1988 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15235 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Retz, Alexander Johannes Gran Chaparal Fase 1 Persea 80 Talavera de la Reina Toledo / ES | [1986/29] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/29] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300071.7 | 07.01.1986 | [1986/29] | Priority number, date | US19850689544 | 07.01.1985 Original published format: US 689544 | [1986/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0187707 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0187707 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/06, F16K7/10 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
G21C13/06 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US);
Y10S277/944 (EP,US);
Y10S411/01 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3631 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1986/29] | G21C13/06 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/29] | Title | German: | Aufblasbarer Verschlussstopfen für eine Gewindebohrung im Reaktorgefäss | [1986/29] | English: | An inflatable plug for a reactor vessel stud hole | [1986/29] | French: | Bouchon gonflable pour un trou taraudé de la cuve d'un réacteur | [1986/29] | File destroyed: | 22.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 02.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/03] | 29.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1989/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.02.1988 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4312708 (LESLIE BRUCE E); | [A]US4342336 (SATTERTHWAITE J GLENN, et al); | [A]US4398565 (WILLIAMSON GERONIMO C [US]); | [A]CH201377 (KOENIG KARL [CH]) |