EP0189260 - High strength feldspathic porcelain and method for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 4678530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oda, Isao 19 Gokuraku 3-chome Meito-ku Nagoya-City Aichi Pref. / JP | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300142.6 | 10.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | JP19850007139 | 18.01.1985 Original published format: JP 713985 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189260 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189260 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189260 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C04B33/26 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
C04B33/26 (EP,KR,US);
C04B33/24 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1986/31] | Title | German: | Hochfestes feldspatähnliches Porzellan und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1986/31] | English: | High strength feldspathic porcelain and method for producing the same | [1986/31] | French: | Porcelaine feldspathique à haute résistance et procédé de sa fabrication | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/09] | 11.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1453764 (NGK INSULATORS LTD); | [A]US3674519 (HIGUCHI NOBORU, et al); | [A]GB2056431 (ROSENTHAL TECHNIK AG) |