EP0193255 - Apparatus for unloading a container having a matrix of storage positions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1986/36] | Method and apparatus for unloading a container having a matrix of storage positions | ||
[1991/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1991 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1991 [1991/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, Steven P. 639 Revere Road Glen Ellyn Illinois 60137 / US | 02 /
Wolyn, Joseph 18320 W. Woodland Terrace Gurnee Illinois 60031 / US | [1986/36] | Representative(s) | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/36] | Slight, Geoffrey Charles, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300182.2 | 14.01.1986 | [1986/36] | Priority number, date | US19850703358 | 20.02.1985 Original published format: US 703358 | [1986/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0193255 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0193255 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0193255 | Date: | 02.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/02, H01R43/00, B65G65/00 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
B65G65/00 (EP);
H01R43/00 (EP);
H05K13/021 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/36] | H05K13/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1986/36] | Title | German: | Gerät zum Entladen eines Lagerbehälters, der eine Matrix von Lagerungspositionen enthält | [1991/01] | English: | Apparatus for unloading a container having a matrix of storage positions | [1991/01] | French: | Appareil pour décharger une boîte à stockage contenant une matrice de positions de stockage | [1991/01] |
Former [1986/36] | Verfahren und Gerät zum Entladen eines Lagerbehälters, der eine Matrix von Lagerungspositionen enthält | ||
Former [1986/36] | Method and apparatus for unloading a container having a matrix of storage positions | ||
Former [1986/36] | Méthode et appareil pour décharger une boîte à stockage contenant une matrice de positions de stockage | Examination procedure | 11.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/15] | 09.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3528160 ; | [X]US3443707 |