EP0194006 - Analogous interferon polypeptides, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.1993 [1993/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | [1986/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camble, Roger 8 Yew Tree Close Macclesfield Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Edge, Michael Derek 6 Tudor Way Congleton Cheshire / GB | [1986/37] | Representative(s) | Mack, John Richard, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/37] | Mack, John Richard, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300304.2 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/37] | Priority number, date | GB19850002605 | 01.02.1985 Original published format: GB 8502605 | US19850748558 | 25.06.1985 Original published format: US 748558 | [1986/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0194006 | Date: | 10.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0194006 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07K15/26, C12N15/00, C12P21/02, A61K37/66 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
C07K14/56 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1986/37] | C07K15/26, C12N15/00, C12P21/02, A61K45/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1986/37] | Title | German: | Analoge Interferon-Polypeptide, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen | [1986/37] | English: | Analogous interferon polypeptides, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [1986/37] | French: | Polypeptides analogues d'interféron, procédé pour les préparer et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [1986/37] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 14.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/16] | 02.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8304053 ; | [Y]WO8400776 ; | [Y]EP0100561 ; | [Y]EP0089692 ; | [Y]WO8302460 ; | [Y]WO8302459 ; | [Y]WO8302458 ; | [Y]WO8302457 ; | [Y]EP0076489 ; | [Y]EP0072541 ; | [Y]EP0062971 ; | [Y]EP0051873 ; | [Y]EP0032134 | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 212, 5th June 1981, pages 1159-1162, AAAS; R. LAWN et al.: "DNA sequence of two closely linked human leukocyte interferon genes" |