EP0192329 - Metal-forming lubricant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1991 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.1991 [1991/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | For all designated states ALCAN INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 1188 Sherbrooke Street West Montreal Quebec H3A 3G2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daglish, Alan Robert 54 West Bar Banbury Oxfordshire / GB | 02 /
Foster, Mark Howard 13 Blenheim Road Banbury Oxfordshire / GB | 03 /
Marwick, William Francis 27 Bell Lane Byfield Northants / GB | [1986/35] | Representative(s) | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/35] | Pennant, Pyers, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300311.7 | 17.01.1986 | [1986/35] | Priority number, date | GB19850002148 | 29.01.1985 Original published format: GB 8502148 | [1986/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0192329 | Date: | 27.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0192329 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C10M111/00, B21D22/20 | [1986/35] | CPC: |
B21D22/201 (EP,US);
C10M105/68 (EP,KR,US);
C10M101/025 (EP,US);
C10M105/12 (EP,US);
C10M105/34 (EP,US);
C10M105/36 (EP,US);
C10M107/04 (EP,US);
C10M111/00 (EP,KR,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2205/0225 (EP,US);
C10M2205/14 (EP,US);
C10M2205/143 (EP,US);
C10M2205/16 (EP,US);
C10M2205/163 (EP,US);
C10M2205/17 (EP,US);
C10M2205/173 (EP,US);
C10M2205/183 (EP,US);
C10M2207/021 (EP,US);
C10M2207/0215 (EP,US);
C10M2207/022 (EP,US);
C10M2207/125 (EP,US);
C10M2207/129 (EP,US);
C10M2207/281 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2815 (EP,US);
C10M2207/282 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2825 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2845 (EP,US);
C10M2207/2855 (EP,US);
C10M2207/286 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2207/34 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/0806 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/1006 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/285 (EP,US);
C10N2040/24 (EP,US);
C10N2040/241 (EP,US);
C10N2040/242 (EP,US);
C10N2040/243 (EP,US);
C10N2040/244 (EP,US);
C10N2040/245 (EP,US);
C10N2040/246 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1986/35] | Title | German: | Schmiermittel für das Formen von Metall | [1986/35] | English: | Metal-forming lubricant | [1986/35] | French: | Lubrifiant pour le formage de métaux | [1986/35] | Examination procedure | 24.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 27.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.11.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP77023641B ; | [A]US2530838 (OROZCO GILBERT H, et al); | [A]US3425379 (COLLINS HERBERT E, et al); | [A]DE2263586 (NIPPON STEEL CORP); | [A]GB2003415 (AMERICAN CAN CO); | [A]GB2097802 (AMERICAN CAN CO) | [X] - JAPANESE PATENTS REPORT, vol. 77, no. 26, 29th July 1977, Section J7-H, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; & JP - B - 77 023 641 (NIHON KOSA KUYU K.K.) 25-06-1977, & JP77023641B B 00000000 |