EP0189296 - A semiconductor laser device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maei, Shigeki 2613-1, Ichinomoto-cho Tenri-shi Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Yamamoto, Saburo 1-2-11, Akanedai Haibara-cho Uda-gun Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Hiroshi 5-8, 11-chome, Nagamodai Kamo-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto / JP | [1986/31] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1986/31] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 86300345.5 | 20.01.1986 | [1986/31] | Priority number, date | JP19850011442 | 23.01.1985 Original published format: JP 1144285 | [1986/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0189296 | Date: | 30.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0189296 | Date: | 16.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0189296 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/19 | [1986/31] | CPC: |
H01S5/16 (EP);
H01S5/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1986/31] | Title | German: | Halbleiterlaser | [1986/31] | English: | A semiconductor laser device | [1986/31] | French: | Laser à semi-conducteur | [1986/31] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/31] | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP58197787 ; | [A]JP5642393 ; | [A]EP0095826 ; | [A]US4282494 | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, vol. 42, no. 5, March 1983, pages 406-408, American Institute of Physics, New York, US; S. YAMAMOTO et al.: "High optical power cw operation in visible spectral range by window V-channeled substrate inner stripe lasers" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 39 (E-228)[1476], 21st February 1984; & JP-A-58 197 787 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 17-11-1983, & JP58197787 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 99 (E-63)[771], 26th June 1981; & JP-A-56 42 393 (NIPPON DENKI K.K.) 20-04-1981, & JP5642393 A 00000000 |